CA AB1695 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 639, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 639, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 50467 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing.
Title
Affordable housing loan and grant programs: adaptive reuse.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1695 Santiago By Stern (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1695 Santiago Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1695 Santiago By Stern (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 1695 Santiago Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1695 Santiago Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1695 Santiago By Stern (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 1695 Santiago Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 639, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-12 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5240.). |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-07-20 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 12. Page 5019.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (May 18). |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2022-01-26 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 25. |
2022-01-25 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 50467 | New Code | See Bill Text |