CA AB1695 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 47, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 47, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 148.5 and 29805 of the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms: false reports of stolen firearms.
Sponsors
Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. Mike Gipson [D] | Asm. Marc Levine [D] | Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-30 - Assembly - AB 1695 BONTA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 52 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1695 Bonta By Jackson (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1695 BONTA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1695 Bonta By Jackson (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1695 BONTA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 47, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-07-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 5587.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 5587.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 5590.). |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 4629.). |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 20). |
2016-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 5120.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 28. Page 5137.) |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 5.) (May 27). |
2016-04-06 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-03-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-02-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-01-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 21. |
2016-01-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 148.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 16520 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 29305 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 29310 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 29805 | Amended Code | Citation Text |