CA AB1693 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 910.3, 8281, 8282, 8283, 8284, 8285, and 8286 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to public utilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public utilities: contracting.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-04-10AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on U. & E.
2019-04-09AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on U. & E.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback