CA AB1688 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 605, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 605, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 361.2 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.
Title
Dependent children: out-of-county placement: notice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-16 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1688 Rodriguez By Jackson (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Assembly - AB 1688 RODRIGUEZ Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Assembly - AB 1688 RODRIGUEZ Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 605, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-22 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2016-08-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5011.). |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2016-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4593.) |
2016-04-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 20). |
2016-03-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-02-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2016-01-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 21. |
2016-01-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 361.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |