CA AB1686 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 26051.5 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to marijuana.
Title
Adult-use cannabis and medicinal cannabis: licenses: application: labor peace agreement.
Sponsors
Asm. Todd Gloria [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 1686 GLORIA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 1686 GLORIA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-01 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1620.) |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 10). |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B. & P. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19322 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 26051.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65584 | Amended Code | Citation Text |