CA AB1682 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Hearing: Apr 22 @ 2:30 pm in State Capitol, Room 126
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 17052.2 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Personal income taxes: caregiver tax credit.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2019-03-28AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Revenue and Taxation Code17052Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code17052.2New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback