CA AB1671 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 533, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 116810 of, and to add Sections 116407 and 116555.5 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to drinking water.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Backflow protection and cross-connection controls: standards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-15 - Assembly - AB 1671 Caballero Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1671 Caballero By Wieckowski (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1671 CABALLERO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-06 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 533, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-06 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-26AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2017-09-15AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 3524.).
2017-09-15AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2017-09-14SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2939.).
2017-09-13SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-12SenateOrdered to second reading.
2017-09-12SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2017-09-12SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-09-12SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2017-09-01SenateIn committee: Held under submission.
2017-08-21SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-11SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-21SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-08SenateReferred to Com. on EQ.
2017-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 1802.)
2017-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 24).
2017-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2017-04-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
2017-04-03AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-03-29AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2017-03-28AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code116407New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code116555.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code116801New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code116810Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback