CA AB1671 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 11291 to the Water Code, relating to water.
Title
Sacramento-San Joaquin Delta: water conveyance system.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Frazier [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. |
2014-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2014-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 11291 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1671&sess=1314&house=A |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1651-1700/ab_1671_bill_20140212_introduced.html |