CA AB1671 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-27 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-27 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 25060 of the Government Code, relating to county government.
Title
County board of supervisors: vacancy: appointment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-09 - Senate - Special Consent #30 AB1671 Jeffries (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-20 - Assembly - AB 1671 JEFFRIES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-20 - Assembly - AB 1671 JEFFRIES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-27 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2010-08-16 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:55 p.m. | |
2010-08-09 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2010-08-09 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4410.) | |
2010-08-04 | Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |
2010-08-03 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-02 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2010-06-30 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 30). | |
2010-06-03 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2010-05-20 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-05-20 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 5251.) | |
2010-05-18 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-17 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2010-05-13 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 12). | |
2010-05-05 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2010-04-22 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 21). | |
2010-04-13 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2010-04-12 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-04-07 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Further hearing to be set. | |
2010-03-11 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2010-03-10 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-03-03 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2010-03-02 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-01-27 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2010-01-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 20. | |
2010-01-20 | Read first time. To print. |