CA AB1668 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 282, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 282, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 23826.19 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.
Title
Alcoholic beverages: licenses: County of Placer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-07 - Assembly - AB 1668 Joe Patterson Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1668 Joe Patterson et al. By Niello (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Assembly - AB 1668 Joe Patterson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1668 Joe Patterson et al. By Niello (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Assembly - AB 1668 Joe Patterson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 282, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3034.). |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2357.). |
2023-07-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-07-11 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2023-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1367.) |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 19). |
2023-03-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2023-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 23826.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |