CA AB1667 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 754, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 754, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 24616 and 24617 of, to add Sections 22132.5, 22206.1, 22206.2, 22206.3, 22206.4, 22206.5, 22325, 22326, 23012, and 24616.2 to, and to repeal Section 24616.5 of, the Education Code, and making an appropriation therefor, relating to teachers’ retirement.
Title
State Teachers’ Retirement System: administration.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Cooper [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1667 Cooper Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1667 Cooper By Pan (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1667 Cooper Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1667 Cooper By Pan (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1667 Cooper Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 754, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-12 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5215.). |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-08 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-07-20 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD. |
2022-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.) |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 19). |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 19. |
2022-01-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 22132.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 22206.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 22206.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 22206.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 22206.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 22206.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 22325 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 22326 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 23012 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 24616 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 24616.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 24616.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 24617 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |