CA AB1666 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 42, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 42, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 123467.5 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to abortion, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Abortion: civil actions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1666 Bauer-Kahan et al. By Limón Urgency Clause (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1666 Bauer-Kahan Third Reading Urgency (Y: 56 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Assembly - AB 1666 Bauer-Kahan Assembly Third Reading Amendment Set #1 (Y: 49 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1666 Bauer-Kahan Third Reading Urgency (Y: 56 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Assembly - AB 1666 Bauer-Kahan Assembly Third Reading Amendment Set #1 (Y: 49 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 42, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-06-24 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-06-24 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. | |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 4394.). |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 14). |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 15. Page 4827.). |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 49. Noes 11. Page 4568.) |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (April 5). |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-03-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-15 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (March 15). |
2022-01-27 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HEALTH. |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 19. |
2022-01-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 123467.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |