CA AB1666 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 560, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 560, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 65040.17 to the Government Code, relating to state government, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
The California Complete Count: local educational agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-12 - Assembly - AB 1666 Reyes Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1666 Reyes By Durazo Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - AB 1666 Reyes Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1666 Reyes By Durazo Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - AB 1666 Reyes Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 560, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3498.). |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2854.). |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1773.) |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65040.17 | New Code | See Bill Text |