CA AB1665 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-09-10 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Wieckowski.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 1798.99.2 to the Civil Code, relating to business.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Parent’s Accountability and Child Protection Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - AB 1665 Chau Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-10SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Wieckowski.
2019-07-11SenateOrdered to third reading.
2019-07-11SenateFrom Consent Calendar.
2019-07-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-07-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 2).
2019-05-29SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2019-05-20SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1724.)
2019-05-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-08AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-05-07AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 30).
2019-03-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code1798.99.2New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback