CA AB1664 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 30515 and 30900 of, and to add Section 30680 to, the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms: assault weapons.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Levine [D] | Asm. Philip Ting [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] |
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. Mike Gipson [D] | Asm. Kevin McCarty [D] | Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D] |
Asm. Miguel Santiago [D] | Sen. Mark Leno [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1664 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1664 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | Died on Senate inactive file. |
2016-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file pursuant to Senate Rule 29. |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 20). |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 5120.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 43. Noes 31. Page 5136.) |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 6.) (May 27). |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2016-03-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-02-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-01-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 14. |
2016-01-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 30515 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 30680 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 30900 | Amended Code | Citation Text |