CA AB1663 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Sections 1520.12 and 1534.6 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to care facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Group homes: immigrant children.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-29 - Assembly - AB 1663 GARCIA, C. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-26SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-06-26SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-06-25SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2018-06-20SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-06-07SenateReferred to Coms. on EQ. and GOV. & F.
2018-01-29SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-01-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 3865.)
2018-01-23AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-01-22AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-01-18AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (January 18).
2017-05-26AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-10AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2017-04-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
2017-04-06AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2017-03-30AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2017-03-29AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2017-03-28AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback