CA AB1660 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 6 (commencing with Section 8050) to Chapter 13 of Division 3 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to court reporters, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Court reporter providers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-11 - Assembly - AB 1660 KALRA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 53 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1660 Kalra By Hill (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1660 KALRA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 27 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-15 Vetoed by Governor.
2017-09-19AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2017-09-11AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 3146.).
2017-09-07AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-09-07SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 12. Page 2572.).
2017-09-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-01SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-08-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-08-28SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2017-08-21SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-08-21SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-07-10SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-06SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 3).
2017-06-20SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2017-06-08SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2017-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 27. Page 1840.)
2017-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 24).
2017-05-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-02AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2017-05-01AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (April 25).
2017-04-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2017-04-03AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-30AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code8050New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback