CA AB1656 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-31 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Leyva.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-31 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Leyva.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 26003 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to cannabis.
Title
Cannabis: industrial hemp.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Assembly - AB 1656 Aguiar-Curry Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Assembly - AB 1656 Aguiar-Curry Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Leyva. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 6). |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 1. Page 4255.) |
2022-03-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 29). |
2022-01-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2022-01-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 14. |
2022-01-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 26003 | New Code | See Bill Text |