CA AB1652 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 1). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
Pending: Senate Elections and Constitutional Amendments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 1). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
Pending: Senate Elections and Constitutional Amendments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1006 and 35107 of the Education Code, relating to school governance.
Title
County boards of education: school district governing boards: members: charter school employees.
Sponsors
Asm. Jose Medina [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - AB 1652 Medina Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - AB 1652 Medina Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 1). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and E. & C.A. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 0. Page 4403.) |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 6). |
2022-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-14 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-01-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-01-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 14. |
2022-01-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 1006 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 35107 | Amended Code | Citation Text |