CA AB1652 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 7286 of the Government Code, and to amend Sections 148 and 408 of the Penal Code, relating to law enforcement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law enforcement agency policies: use of force: protests.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - AB 1652 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-02SenateRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-07-02SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
2020-06-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-29SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-06-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-25SenateOrdered to second reading.
2020-06-25SenateFrom inactive file.
2019-08-30SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hertzberg.
2019-06-19SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-06-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 18).
2019-05-16SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-05-06SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-06AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 10. Page 1504.)
2019-04-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 23).
2019-03-25AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-03-21AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-21AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code7286Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code148Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code408Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback