CA AB1651 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 765, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 765, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 87623 to the Education Code, relating to community colleges.
Title
Community colleges: academic employees: involuntary administrative leave.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-13 - Assembly - AB 1651 Reyes Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1651 Reyes By Pan (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1651 REYES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 25 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1651 Reyes By Pan (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1651 REYES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 25 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 765, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-21 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 3321.). |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3255.) |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 14. Page 2769.). |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 21). |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 1786.) |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1708.) |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 25). |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 87623 | New Code | See Bill Text |