CA AB1648 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-15 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 53572 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Housing: school employees: affordable rental housing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-15AssemblyIn committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-05-01AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2019-04-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a).
2019-04-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2019-04-11AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-04AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-03-28AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2019-03-27AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-18AssemblyReferred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and H. & C.D.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code53572Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback