CA AB1643 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 4710 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to developmental services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Developmental services: fair hearings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1643 Eduardo Garcia Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2019-07-02SenateIn committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-06-20SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2019-06-04SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-05-29SenateReferred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2019-05-23SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1830.)
2019-05-16AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-05-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 15).
2019-05-13AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.)
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2019-03-28AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on HUM. S.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4710Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback