CA AB1643 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 879, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 48321 of the Education Code, relating to pupil attendance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pupil attendance: school attendance review boards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-08-26 - Assembly - AB 1643 BUCHANAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1643 Buchanan By Huff (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1643 BUCHANAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 879, Statutes of 2014.
2014-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2014-09-08AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2014-08-26AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6444.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6470.).
2014-08-25AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2014-08-25SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4815.).
2014-08-19SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2014-08-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
2014-08-04SenateIn committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2014-06-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-06-12SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
2014-06-05SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2014-05-29SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2014-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 9. Page 5345.)
2014-05-27AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2014-05-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2014-04-30AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2014-04-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-04-22AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2014-04-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 9).
2014-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2014-04-02AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2014-03-26AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2014-02-20AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2014-02-12AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
2014-02-11AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code48321Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1643&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1601-1650/ab_1643_bill_20140211_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1601-1650/ab_1643_bill_20140402_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1601-1650/ab_1643_bill_20140422_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1601-1650/ab_1643_bill_20140523_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1601-1650/ab_1643_bill_20140612_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1601-1650/ab_1643_bill_20140819_amended_sen_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1601-1650/ab_1643_bill_20140829_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1601-1650/ab_1643_bill_20140930_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1601-1650/ab_1643_vote_20140409_000003_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1601-1650/ab_1643_vote_20140523_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1601-1650/ab_1643_vote_20140529_1239PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1601-1650/ab_1643_vote_20140618_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1601-1650/ab_1643_vote_20140804_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1601-1650/ab_1643_vote_20140814_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1601-1650/ab_1643_vote_20140825_0302PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1601-1650/ab_1643_vote_20140826_0528PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback