CA AB1642 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 465, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 465, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 14132.275, 14186.4, 14197, 14197.05, 14302.1, 14409, 14456.5, 14712, 14713, and 14715 of, to add Sections 14197.04 and 14197.7 to, and to repeal Section 14304 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal: managed care plans.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-09 - Assembly - AB 1642 Wood Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-06 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1642 Wood By Pan (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1642 Wood Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-06 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1642 Wood By Pan (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1642 Wood Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 465, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-18 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3163.). |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (September 6). |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3040.) |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 1. Page 2523.). |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 10). |
2019-07-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 2. Page 2101.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (May 16). |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.) |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.) |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 9). |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14132.275 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14186.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14197 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14197.04 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14197.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14197.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14302.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14304 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14409 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14456.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14712 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14713 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14715 | Amended Code | Citation Text |