CA AB1639 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-29 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-29 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 39712.1 tothe Health and Safety Code, relating to greenhouse gases.
Title
California Global Warming Solutions Act of 2006: greenhouse gas emissions limit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-29 | Assembly | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2014-04-28 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4633.) (pending re-referral to the Com. on TRANS.) In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2014-02-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2014-02-11 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 38597.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 39712 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 39712.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |