CA AB1637 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 658, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 379.6 and 2827.10 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Energy: greenhouse gas reduction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1637 LOW Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 47 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-08-31 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-08-30 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1637 Low By Beall (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Assembly - AB 1637 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-26 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 658, Statutes of 2016.
2016-09-26 Approved by the Governor.
2016-09-09AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
2016-08-31AssemblyFrom committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 31). Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6544.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 47. Noes 27. Page 6552.).
2016-08-31AssemblyFrom committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (August 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6514.)
2016-08-29AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6401.)
2016-08-25AssemblyRe-referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2016-08-23AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Measure version as amended on August 18 corrected.
2016-08-22SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 5238.).
2016-08-19SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 5167.) Ordered to third reading.
2016-08-18SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2016-08-16SenateWithdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2016-05-05SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2016-04-28SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2016-04-28AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 4588.)
2016-04-25AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 4488.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading.
2016-04-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2016-04-14AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended.
2016-02-01AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2016-01-08AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 7.
2016-01-07AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code2827.10Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code379.6Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1637&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1601-1650/ab_1637_bill_20160107_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1601-1650/ab_1637_bill_20160414_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1601-1650/ab_1637_bill_20160818_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1601-1650/ab_1637_bill_20160902_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1601-1650/ab_1637_bill_20160926_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1601-1650/ab_1637_vote_20160428_1014AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1601-1650/ab_1637_vote_20160822_0539PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1601-1650/ab_1637_vote_20160830_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1601-1650/ab_1637_vote_20160831_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1601-1650/ab_1637_vote_20160831_0417PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback