CA AB1636 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 453, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 453, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 480, 2232, and 2307 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Physician’s and surgeon’s certificate: registered sex offenders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1636 Akilah Weber et al. By Pan (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 1636 Akilah Weber Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 1636 Akilah Weber Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 453, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-23 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2022-08-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4903.). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4910.) |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 11). |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 19). |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2022-04-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2022-01-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 12. |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2232 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2307 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 480 | Amended Code | Citation Text |