CA AB1635 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 19596.2 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to horse racing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Horse racing: out-of-state thoroughbred races: Pegasus World Cup Invitational.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-21 - Assembly - AB 1635 Gray Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-21SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-01-21AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2020-01-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-01-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (January 8).
2019-03-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on G.O.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code19596.2Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback