CA AB1633 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 633, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 633, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 65080.02 to the Government Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Regional transportation plans: traffic signal optimization plans.
Sponsors
Asm. Tim Grayson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-05 - Assembly - AB 1633 Grayson Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1633 Grayson By Skinner (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 1633 Grayson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1633 Grayson By Skinner (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 1633 Grayson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 633, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3027.). |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2449.). |
2019-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-21 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-15 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-15 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2019-08-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on EQ. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2019-06-05 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and EQ. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1362.) |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 10). |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65080.02 | New Code | See Bill Text |