CA AB1628 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 360, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 56668 and 65040.12 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 30107.3 of the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental justice.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environmental justice.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-09 - Assembly - AB 1628 Robert Rivas Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 61 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1628 Robert Rivas et al. By Gonzalez (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - AB 1628 Robert Rivas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 15 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-27 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 360, Statutes of 2019.
2019-09-27 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-18AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-09AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 15. Page 3115.).
2019-09-05AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-09-04SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 2504.).
2019-08-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-26SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-07-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-07-08SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2019-06-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-14SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-06-05SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-05-22SenateReferred to Coms. on EQ. and JUD.
2019-05-14SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-13AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 15. Page 1632.)
2019-05-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 8).
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-03-18AssemblyReferred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code56668Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code65040.12Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code30107.3Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback