CA AB1625 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 352, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 352, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 22508.5 of the Vehicle Code, relating to parking meters.
Title
Inoperable parking meters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-05 - Assembly - AB 1625 RUBIO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # A (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # AB1625 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Assembly - AB 1625 RUBIO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # A (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # AB1625 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Assembly - AB 1625 RUBIO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 352, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-12 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2943.). |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2349.). |
2017-08-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-07-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 11). |
2017-07-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1137.) |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 5). |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 22508.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |