CA AB1623 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Sections 17132.9 and 17132.10 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Personal income taxes: exclusion: uniformed services retirement pay: survivor benefit plan payments.
Sponsors
Asm. James Ramos [D] | Sen. Kelly Seyarto [R] | Sen. Brian Jones [R] | Asm. Devon Mathis [R] |
Asm. Eloise Reyes [D] | Asm. Rudy Salas [D] | Asm. Marie Waldron [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4736.) |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (May 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-03-22 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing for testimony only. |
2022-03-14 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17132.10 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17132.9 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |