CA AB1622 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 632, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 632, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1682 and 2746.2 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Section 6254.18 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 1339.7, 1367.695, 101560, 123515, 127900, 128205, and 151001 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 10123.84 of the Insurance Code, to amend Section 1308.8 of the Labor Code, to amend Section 13776 of the Penal Code, and to amend Sections 14088 and 14134.5 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to family physicians.
Title
Family physicians.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Assembly - AB 1622 Carrillo Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1622 Carrillo By Hurtado (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1622 Carrillo Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1622 Carrillo By Hurtado (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1622 Carrillo Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 632, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3417.). |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3370.) |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2764.). |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-19 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-08-07 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2011.) |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1620.) |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 2). |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B. & P. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 1682 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2746.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 6254.18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 101560 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 123515 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 127900 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 128205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1339.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1367.695 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 151001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.84 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1308.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 13776 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14088 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14134.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |