CA AB1622 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 66021.8 to, and to add Chapter 3.67 (commencing with Section 44778) to Part 25 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, the Education Code, relating to student support services.
Title
Student support services: Dream Resource Liaisons.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. Autumn Burke [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] |
Sen. Monique Limon [D] | Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D] | Sen. Richard Pan [D] | Asm. Blanca Rubio [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66021.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |