CA AB162 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 101, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 101, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 21651.1 of the Vehicle Code, relating to state highways, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
State highways: wrong-way driving.
Sponsors
Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D] | Asm. Rocky Chavez [R] | Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] | Asm. Tom Lackey [R] |
Sen. Joel Anderson [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-29 - Assembly - AB 162 RODRIGUEZ Concurrence- Urgency Added (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB162 Rodriguez By Pan (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Assembly - AB 162 RODRIGUEZ Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB162 Rodriguez By Pan (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Assembly - AB 162 RODRIGUEZ Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-15 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 101, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-07-15 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-07-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2015-06-29 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2169.). |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1613.). |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1222.) |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 22). |
2015-04-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-03-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2015-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2015-02-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2015-01-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 21. |
2015-01-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 21651.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |