CA AB1619 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-07 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Business and Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-07 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Business and Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 4074.1 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to pharmacy.
Title
Pharmacists: drug disclosures: cannabis or cannabidiol interactions.
Sponsors
Asm. Diane Dixon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-07 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2023-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 4074.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |