CA AB1616 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 157, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 157, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 7592.8 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.
Title
Alarm companies: liability: false alarm.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-17 - Assembly - AB 1616 NAZARIAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1616 Nazarian (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 1616 NAZARIAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1616 Nazarian (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 1616 NAZARIAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-31 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 157, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-07-31 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-07-21 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2017-07-17 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2569.). |
2017-07-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-07-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2022.). |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-07-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 5). |
2017-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Measure version as amended on June 12 corrected. |
2017-06-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 1613.) |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 2). |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 3013 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7592.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |