CA AB1615 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 142, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 142, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to the payment of claims against the state, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Claims against the state: payment.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gatto [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1615 Gatto Urgency Clause (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Assembly - AB 1615 GATTO Third Reading Urgency (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Assembly - AB 1615 GATTO Third Reading Urgency (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 142, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-07-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-07-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 3. Page 4193.). |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 23). |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 5162.). |
2014-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 21). |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-02-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. |
2014-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |