CA AB161 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 43, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 43, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend the Budget Act of 2021 by amending Items 0954-001-0001, 3830-001-0001, 6440-001-0001, 6870-201-0001, and 6980-101-0001 of Section 2.00 of, and amending Sections 16.00, 19.55, and 39.00 of, that act, relating to the state budget, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, budget bill.
Title
Budget Act of 2021.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-07-08 - Assembly - AB 161 TING Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-08 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB161 Ting By Skinner (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 161 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-08 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB161 Ting By Skinner (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 161 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 43, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-07-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-07-08 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2021-07-08 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2273.). |
2021-07-08 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 16. Page 2272.) |
2021-07-08 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 16. Page 2272.) |
2021-07-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-07-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1854.). |
2021-07-08 | Senate | Senate Rule 29 suspended. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 1852.) |
2021-07-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-07-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 7). |
2021-07-05 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 8. Page 1794.) |
2021-07-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 492.) |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 17. Page 432.) |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-01-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. |
2021-01-08 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |