CA AB161 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-07 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 7514.2 of the Government Code, relating to public employees’ retirement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public employees’ retirement: pension fund management.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 161 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-07SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-08-07SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-08-21SenateIn committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-07-05SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-06-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-14SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2017-06-01SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 14. Page 1903.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 26).
2017-04-26AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-03-29AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-01-30AssemblyReferred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
2017-01-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 16.
2017-01-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code13314New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code7514.2Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback