CA AB161 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-15 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 2.6 (commencing with Section 18898) to Division 8 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to athletic trainers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Athletic trainers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-09-04 - Assembly - AB 161 CHAU Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB161 Chau By Hernandez (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Assembly - AB 161 CHAU Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-01-15 Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
2015-09-28 Vetoed by Governor.
2015-09-16AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2015-09-04AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2915.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2915.).
2015-09-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2015-09-03SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2478.).
2015-09-01SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-08-31SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2015-08-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-08-17SenateFrom inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
2015-06-22SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hernandez.
2015-06-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-06-08SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8).
2015-05-07SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2015-04-20SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2015-04-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1016.)
2015-04-15AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2015-04-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 14).
2015-04-07AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2015-03-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2015-03-17AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2015-02-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2015-01-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 21.
2015-01-21AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code18898New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_161&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/ab_161_bill_20150121_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/ab_161_bill_20150317_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/ab_161_bill_20150831_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/ab_161_bill_20150909_enrolled.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/ab_161_vote_20150414_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/ab_161_vote_20150420_0146PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/ab_161_vote_20150608_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/ab_161_vote_20150903_0411PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/ab_161_vote_20150904_1033AM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback