CA AB1608 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Jan 23 Assembly Appropriations Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1522 of, and to add Sections 1522.6 and 1522.7 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to community care facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community care facilities: criminal background checks.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-05-08AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-29AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-25AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 23).
2019-04-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2019-04-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-10AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2019-04-09AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on HUM. S.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1522Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1522.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code1522.7New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback