CA AB1608 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 655, 2556.1, 2556.2, 3010.5, 3011, 3013, and 3020 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Sections 846.1 and 1789.37 of the Civil Code, to amend Sections 77, 1345, 1346, 1370, 1371, 1375, 1379, and 1563 of the Code of Civil Procedure, to amend Sections 12117, 17295, 24618, 68121, 70010.1, 70010.5, 76300, 81133, and 89750.5 of the Education Code, to amend Sections 1122 and 15512 of the Fish and Game Code, to amend Sections 3955, 14978.2, and 52295 of the Food and Agricultural Code, to amend Sections 800, 850.6, 900.2, 905.2, 905.3, 906, 911.2, 912.5, 915, 920, 925, 925.4, 925.6, 926, 926.2, 926.4, 926.6, 927.13, 935.6, 935.7, 940.2, 965, 965.1, 965.5, 997.1, 998.2, 1151, 3515.7, 6254.17, 6276.08, 7599.2, 8652, 8902, 11007.6, 11014, 11030.1, 11030.2, 11031, 11125.7, 11125.8, 11270, 11270.1, 11274, 11275, 11852, 11854, 11860, 11862, 11864, 11870, 11872, 11874, 11880, 11890, 11892, 11894, 12432, 12803.2, 13300, 13300.5, 13332.02, 13332.03, 13332.09, 13900, 13901, 13905, 13909, 13951, 13972, 13973, 13974, 13974.1, 13974.5, 13995.40, 14084, 14600, 15202, 16302.1, 16304.6, 16383, 16431, 17051.5, 17201, 18708, 19815.4, 20163, 21223, 21265, 22910, 22911, 26749, 68503, 68506, 68543, 68543.5, 68543.8, and 68565 of, to amend the heading of Article 5 (commencing with Section 11890) of Chapter 10 of Part 1 of, and to amend the heading of Part 4 (commencing with Section 13900) of, Division 3 of Title 2 of, to amend and renumber Sections 13920, 13923, 13928, 13940, 13941, 13942, 13943, 13943.1, 13943.2, 13943.3, and 13944 of, to amend, repeal, and add Section 17518.5 of, to repeal Sections 11276 and 11277 of, to add Sections 11893, 11895, 14659, 14659.01, 14659.02, 14659.03, 14659.04, 14659.05, 14659.06, and 14659.07 to, to add Article 5.2 (commencing with Section 9112) to Chapter 1.5 of Part 1 of Division 2 of, and to add Article 3.5 (commencing with Section 14691) to Chapter 2 of Part 5.5 of Division 3 of, Title 2 of, to add the heading of Article 2.5 (commencing with Section 12433) to Chapter 5 of Part 2 of, and to add the heading of Article 1.1 (commencing with Section 14659) to Chapter 2 of Part 5.5 of, Division 3 of Title 2 of, the Government Code, to amend Sections 1492, 11502, 13052, 25372, 25373, 25374, 25375, 25375.5, 25376, 25377, 25379, 25380, 25381, 25382, and 121270 of, and to repeal Section 25370 of, the Health and Safety Code, to amend Sections 11580.1 and 11872 of the Insurance Code, to amend Sections 1308.10, 1684, 1698, 1700.18, 1706, 1720.9, 2059, 2065, 2658, 2699, 4724, 4725, 4726, 6507, 7311.4, 7314, 7315, 7340, 7341, 7342, 7343, 7344, 7345, 7346, 7347, 7348, 7350, 7351, 7352, 7353, 7354, 7354.5, 7356, 7357, 7373, 7720, 7721, 7722, 7904, 7924, 7929, 7991, 8001, 8002, 9021.6, and 9021.9 of, to amend the heading of Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 7340) of Part 3 of Division 5 of, to amend, repeal, and add Section 2699.3 of, to add Section 1308.11 to, to repeal Section 9021.7 of, and to repeal and add Section 7380 of, the Labor Code, to amend Sections 422.92, 600.2, 600.5, 851.8, 851.865, 987.9, 1191.15, 1191.2, 1202.4, 1202.41, 1214, 1463.02, 1485.5, 1485.55, 1557, 2085.5, 2085.6, 2786, 4900, 4901, 4902, 4904, 4905, 4906, 11163, 11172, 13835.2, and 14030 of the Penal Code, to amend Sections 216 and 9202 of the Probate Code, to amend Sections 10301, 10306, 10308, 10311, 10326.2, and 12102.2 of the Public Contract Code, to amend Sections 4116, 4602.6, 5093.68, and 30171.2 of, and to add Chapter 6.7 (commencing with Section 21189.50) to Division 13 of, the Public Resources Code, to amend Sections 17059.2, 23636, and 23689 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, to amend Section 30162 of the Streets and Highways Code, to amend Sections 1095 and 14013 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, and to amend Sections 1752.81, 1752.82, 4461, 11212, 14171.5, 14171.6, and 15634 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to state government, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
State government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Assembly - AB 1608 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Assembly - AB 1608 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | Died on Senate inactive file. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Leno. |
2016-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (June 15). Senate Rule 29 suspended. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 4327.) Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2016-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 4574.) |
2016-04-25 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 4488.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2016-01-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 7. |
2016-01-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |