CA AB1607 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 293, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 51.6 and 55.63 of the Civil Code, relating to civil rights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gender discrimination: notification.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1607 Boerner Horvath Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1607 Boerner Horvath et a By Stern (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 1607 Boerner Horvath Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-12 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 293, Statutes of 2019.
2019-09-12 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-05AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2019-08-30AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2900.).
2019-08-27AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-08-26SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2272.).
2019-08-13SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-12SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2019-07-05SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-03SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3).
2019-06-13SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2019-06-12SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 11).
2019-05-22SenateReferred to Coms. on JUD. and GOV. & F.
2019-05-09SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-09AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1578.)
2019-05-02AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 1).
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code51.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code55.63Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback