CA AB1606 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Died on third reading file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Died on third reading file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 92163 to the Education Code, and to add Section 17201.2 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to the University of California, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
University of California: school of medicine: San Joaquin Valley Regional Campus Medical Education Endowment Fund.
Sponsors
Asm. Adam Gray [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | Died on third reading file. |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.) |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.) |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and REV. & TAX. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 92163 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17201.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |