CA AB1606 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 453, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 12012.81 to the Government Code, relating to tribal gaming, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tribal gaming: compact ratification.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1606 COOPER Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1606 Cooper et al. By Galgiani Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1606 COOPER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-03 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 453, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-03 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-07AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2017-08-31AssemblyUrgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 2836.).
2017-08-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-08-24SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2228.).
2017-08-23SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-08-22SenateOrdered to second reading.
2017-08-22SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2017-08-21SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-08-21SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2017-07-20SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2017-07-06SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-06-08SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2017-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1801.)
2017-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24).
2017-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-24AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2017-04-20AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2017-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (April 18).
2017-04-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-04-04AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2017-04-03AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and B. & P.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code26101Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12012.81New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback