CA AB1605 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Article 3.5 (commencing with Section 21150) of Chapter 1 of Division 11 of the Vehicle Code, relating to transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

City and County of San Francisco: Crooked Street Reservation and Pricing Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-05 - Assembly - AB 1605 Ting Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1605 Ting et al. By Wiener (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 1605 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-12 Vetoed by Governor.
2019-09-11AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-05AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 23. Page 3026.).
2019-09-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-09-03SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 2441.).
2019-07-10SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-07-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (July 9).
2019-06-13SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-06-12SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 12).
2019-05-16SenateReferred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and TRANS.
2019-05-02SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 18. Page 1466.)
2019-04-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (April 22).
2019-04-11AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-04-10AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-03-28AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code21150New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback