CA AB1605 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 3.5 (commencing with Section 21150) of Chapter 1 of Division 11 of the Vehicle Code, relating to transportation.
Title
City and County of San Francisco: Crooked Street Reservation and Pricing Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-05 - Assembly - AB 1605 Ting Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1605 Ting et al. By Wiener (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 1605 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 18 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1605 Ting et al. By Wiener (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 1605 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 18 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2019-10-12 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 23. Page 3026.). |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 2441.). |
2019-07-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (July 9). |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 12). |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and TRANS. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 18. Page 1466.) |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (April 22). |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 21150 | New Code | See Bill Text |