CA AB1603 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-16 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator McGuire.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-16 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator McGuire.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 3501, 3507, and 3507.1 of the Government Code, relating to public employment.
Title
Meyers-Milias-Brown Act: local public agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1603 RIDLEY-THOMAS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 21 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1603 RIDLEY-THOMAS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 21 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-16 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator McGuire. |
2017-08-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-28 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-08-24 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-07-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 21. Page 1976.) |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 17). |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 3501 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 3507 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 3507.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |